open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Tennessee
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00310
    Party Name:Jones v. Wilkie
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:July 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Case for Trial]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.tnmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?78744
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =