U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mc-00025
  • Case Name: Allen et al v. Wyndham Worldwide Operations, Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 25, 2019: [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
  • July 23, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 21, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac)]
  • July 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order]
  • June 20, 2019: [~Util - Create Case Relationship]
  • June 20, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 13, 2019: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • June 13, 2019: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.