U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mc-00003
  • Case Name: CBL & Associates Management, Inc. et al v. Vaughn Tile Commercial et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 18, 2019: [Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac)]
  • September 17, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order]
  • September 06, 2019: [Default Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order to Show Cause]
  • August 06, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Response (non-motion)]
  • July 12, 2019: [Application for Clerk's Default]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order to Show Cause]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • June 20, 2019: [Affidavit of Service]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.