U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mc-00027
  • Case Name: Monroe et al v. Wyndham Worldwide Operations, Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
August, 2019
  • August 04, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 25, 2019: [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
  • July 23, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 12, 2019: [Response to Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order]
  • June 28, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 21, 2019: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • June 21, 2019: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.