U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00203-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frana et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 19, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 08, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.