U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mc-00020
  • Case Name: United States of America et al v. Executive Health Resources, Inc., et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 09, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 25, 2019: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • July 24, 2019: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.