U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mj-02111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aleman-Duarte
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 04, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 05, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 05, 2019: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • August 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • August 05, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 05, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.