open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Tennessee
    Case Number:3:19-bk-05168
    Party Name:BRENDAN PERRY BANKS
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LEMEH, EVA MARIE [Final Decree Chapter 7]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LEMEH, EVA MARIE [Discharge (Standard) - BK Order (SA)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LEMEH, EVA MARIE [Receipt of Filing Fee(OTC auto)]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LEMEH, EVA MARIE [Certificate of Completion of Financial Management Course (Debtor Only)]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LEMEH, EVA MARIE [Statement of No Presumed Abuse]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LEMEH, EVA MARIE [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LEMEH, EVA MARIE [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LEMEH, EVA MARIE [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LEMEH, EVA MARIE [Pay Filing Fees in Installments - BK Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LEMEH, EVA MARIE [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LEMEH, EVA MARIE [Pay Filing Fees in Installments - BK Motion]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LEMEH, EVA MARIE [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LEMEH, EVA MARIE [Certificate of Credit Counseling Briefing (Debtor Only)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: LEMEH, EVA MARIE [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.tnmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?369423
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =