open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee
    Case Number:4:20-cv-00041
    Party Name:Spencer v. Walmart, Inc. et al (TV2)
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Consent/Nonconsent]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac)]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac)]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Motions To Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Depositions]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Magistrate and Order of Reference]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Consent/Nonconsent]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Motions To Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Motions To Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Depositions]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Depositions]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Corporate Interest]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.tned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?91199
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =