U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mj-04237-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arnold
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Commitment to Another District]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 11, 2019: [Detention]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 27, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 27, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 27, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • August 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order]
  • August 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 19, 2019: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.