U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mc-00037
  • Case Name: Robinson v. Blount County Detention Center
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Mail Returned]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Letter]
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address]
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice of Deficiency (IFP)]
  • August 23, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.