U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mc-00040
  • Case Name: Lemoine v. Mossberg Corporation
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2019: [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
  • October 02, 2019: [Supplement]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac)]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 27, 2019: [Order]
  • September 27, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 23, 2019: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • September 18, 2019: [Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac)]
  • September 18, 2019: [Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac)]
  • September 18, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 18, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 18, 2019: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.