U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mc-00042
  • Case Name: St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council v. Odom Construction Systems, LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • November 12, 2020: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • November 11, 2020: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • November 09, 2020: [Writ Returned]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 13, 2020: [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
  • October 13, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 02, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed (non-USA)]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • September 08, 2020: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • August 25, 2020: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Writ Returned]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 14, 2020: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • May 05, 2020: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • May 05, 2020: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Public Docket Annotation]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 03, 2019: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • December 03, 2019: [Writ Returned]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • October 04, 2019: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac)]
  • September 23, 2019: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.