U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mc-00043
  • Case Name: Harness, Dickey & Pierce, PLC v. Viatek Consumer Products Group, Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order of Recusal]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 04, 2020: [Response to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Consent/Nonconsent]
  • December 18, 2019: [Certificate of Corporate Interest]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Certificate of Corporate Interest]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Failure to File CCI]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge]
  • November 06, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed (non-USA)]
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 16, 2019: [Petition]
  • October 16, 2019: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.