U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mc-00031
  • Case Name: In re Ex Parte Application of CATERPILLAR INC.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Order Administratively Closing Case]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [File Excess Pages]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 07, 2020: [Review]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order Administratively Closing Case]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Strike]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 06, 2020: [Strike]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • December 16, 2019: [Leave]
  • December 09, 2019: [Quash]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 04, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.