U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00301-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawkins
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 12, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 06, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • November 06, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • November 06, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 06, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 06, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.