U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mc-00064
  • Case Name: Palmetto State Armory, LLC v. Huff et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Writ Returned]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • June 04, 2020: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • June 03, 2020: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac)]
  • June 02, 2020: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • March 12, 2020: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.