U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mj-02293-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ross
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 25, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order]
  • August 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2020: [Detention]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 06, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 23, 2019: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.