U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mj-04289-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brescia et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 22, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 22, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 31, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order of Detention ]
  • January 29, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 08, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.