U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez-Martinez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order of Detention ]
  • January 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 22, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 10, 2020: [Detention]
  • January 08, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.