U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mc-00049
  • Case Name: In Re: Nonjudicial Civil Forfeiture Proceeding (PLR2)
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 16, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 13, 2020: [Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.