open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00025
    Party Name:Cutshall v. Little et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Forma Pauperis (Proceed)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.tned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?93308
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =