open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00045
    Party Name:Fowler v. Thyssenkrupp Automotive Systems of America, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:May 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Magistrate and Order of Reference]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Consent/Nonconsent]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Depositions]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Motions To Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Depositions]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Motions To Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Corporate Interest]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Corporate Interest]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.tned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?93312
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =