open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00063
    Party Name:DayCab Company, Inc. v. Prairie Technology, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery]
    Date Published:July 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Revise]
    Date Published:July 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Failure to File Consent/Non-Consent]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Motions To Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Depositions]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac)]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac)]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Patent and Trademark Notice]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Corporate Interest]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.tned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?93309
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =