open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00047
    Party Name:Duckett v. Lyash et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac)]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed (non-USA)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Motions To Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Governing Depositions]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons NOT Issued]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.tned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?93316
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =