U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 23, 2020: [Detention]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 25, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.