U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-03011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pecora
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Hearing]
  • April 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order of Detention ]
  • March 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 26, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.