U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castillo
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • July 29, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 29, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
  • March 31, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order of Detention ]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order]
  • March 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 06, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.