U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mc-00012
  • Case Name: Westgate Resorts Ltd v. Abrams Law Firm
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order]
  • April 10, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 18, 2020: [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
  • March 17, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2020: [Certificate of Corporate Interest]
  • March 17, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Withdrawal]
  • March 09, 2020: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac)]
  • March 09, 2020: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.