U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mc-00015
  • Case Name: Taylor et al v. Parker
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Objection]
  • October 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 05, 2020: [Strike]
  • October 02, 2020: [Response to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 01, 2020: [Intervene]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.