U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garrett
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 12, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order]
  • July 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [Detention]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 13, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 07, 2020: [Detention]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Order of Detention ]
  • March 27, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 26, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.