U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02318-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santiesteban
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 06, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.