U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garth et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 20, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum ]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 04, 2020: [Suppress]
  • September 04, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • May 04, 2020: [Response (non-motion)]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • April 24, 2020: [Supplement]
  • April 24, 2020: [Exhibit List (Court Proceedings ONLY)]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • April 24, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 24, 2020: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 24, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 21, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 16, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • April 16, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • April 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.