U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02322-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 10, 2020: [Detention]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.