U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02332-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Inman
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • April 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2020: [Detention]
  • April 23, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 20, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.