U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mc-00027
  • Case Name: First National Bank of Oneida, N.A. v. Brandt
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Writ Returned]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Writ Returned]
September, 2021
  • September 19, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • September 17, 2021: [Writ Issued]
  • September 13, 2021: [Amend/Revise]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Writ Returned]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Supplement]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 28, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • May 27, 2021: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Letter]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.