U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Horn et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • April 30, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 30, 2020: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 30, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 27, 2020: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 27, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • April 27, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • April 27, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • April 27, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 24, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.