U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson-Spencer
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 12, 2021: [Strike]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • January 05, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • April 30, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 24, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.