U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mc-00031
  • Case Name: Resolution Management Consultants v. Design One Building Systems, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release of Funds]
  • April 22, 2025: [Release of Funds]
  • April 21, 2025: [Release of Funds]
  • April 17, 2025: [Release of Funds]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Objection]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 06, 2022: [Release of Funds]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 06, 2021: [Release of Funds]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Withdrawal]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 14, 2021: [Supplement]
  • January 13, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • January 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Deposit Funds]
  • December 29, 2020: [Deposit Funds]
  • December 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 18, 2020: [Supplement]
  • December 11, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 11, 2020: [Set Aside Judgment]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • December 03, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 09, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.