U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-mj-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Case Sealed]
  • July 22, 2021: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • July 22, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2021: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • July 22, 2021: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • July 22, 2021: [Seal Case]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 13, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 13, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • July 13, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • July 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 13, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 13, 2020: [Arrest ]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 01, 2020: [2703(d) or 2705(b) Paperwork Processed]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Application for an Order Pursuant to 2703(d) or 2705(b)]
  • May 01, 2020: [Application for Order Pursuant to 2703(d) or 2705(b)]
  • May 01, 2020: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 01, 2020: [Affidavit ]
  • May 01, 2020: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.