U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bales
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order]
  • September 17, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • September 14, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 11, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • September 11, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 11, 2020: [Arrest ]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.