U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mc-00008
  • Case Name: Crabtree et al v. Gray et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Mail Returned]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice Regarding Exhibit Withdrawal]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • July 02, 2020: [Notice of Deficiency (IFP)]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • May 19, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.