U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peebles
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • October 09, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order]
  • September 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Order]
  • August 18, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2020: [Extend]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 25, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • May 28, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • May 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.