U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alderson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 10, 2020: [Detention]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 03, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 16, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 21, 2020: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.