U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pittman
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order]
  • June 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.