U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stevenson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [Detention]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 08, 2020: [Exclude]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 15, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order]
  • June 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order]
  • June 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order]
  • June 12, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 12, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 11, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order]
  • June 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 09, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.