U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez-Nava et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • August 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 06, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 03, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • July 30, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 30, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • July 30, 2020: [Order]
  • July 30, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 30, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • July 14, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 14, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • July 01, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 17, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order]
  • June 17, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 16, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 11, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.