U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Beatty
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Sealed Document]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order]
  • September 25, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Letter]
  • July 10, 2020: [Letter]
  • July 07, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • July 07, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 02, 2020: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • July 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 24, 2020: [Letter]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 19, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 19, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 12, 2020: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 12, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 12, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 12, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • June 12, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • June 12, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.