U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • June 22, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 17, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • June 17, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • June 17, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2020: [Arrest ]
  • June 17, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.