U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barrios
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 22, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.